THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/04/25 07:18:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 08 May 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 08 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 3045 Baseline Rd
Neapean ON K2H 8P4

or

201 Georgian Dr
Barrie ON L4M 6M2
Date Received: 19 Nov 2018

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 08 May 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 08 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 3045 Baseline Rd
Neapean ON K2H 8P4

or

201 Georgian Dr
Barrie ON L4M 6M2
Date Received: 19 Nov 2018

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 19 Nov 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Dec 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2017
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2008
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 19 Nov 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Nov 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2008