THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 04:11:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patient records stayed with the owner of the clinic, Mr. George Oduro, Pharmacist. Patients may write to the clinic address at Rymal Medical Clinic, 2247 Rymal Road, Stoney Creek, ON L8J 2V8. If unsuccessful, please contact the College of Pharmacists and/or the Information and Privacy Commissioners Office.
Date Received: 28 Aug 2015

Instructions/Address: Please send requests to the address above.
Rymal Medical Clinic
2247 Rymal Road
Stoney Creek ON L8J 2V8
Attention: Record Request Dr. Bombin
Date Received: 10 Nov 2014

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Victoria Bombin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 May 2014

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE, SPANISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patient records stayed with the owner of the clinic, Mr. George Oduro, Pharmacist. Patients may write to the clinic address at Rymal Medical Clinic, 2247 Rymal Road, Stoney Creek, ON L8J 2V8. If unsuccessful, please contact the College of Pharmacists and/or the Information and Privacy Commissioners Office.
Date Received: 28 Aug 2015

Instructions/Address: Please send requests to the address above.
Rymal Medical Clinic
2247 Rymal Road
Stoney Creek ON L8J 2V8
Attention: Record Request Dr. Bombin
Date Received: 10 Nov 2014

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Victoria Bombin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 May 2014

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 25 Mar 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 25 Mar 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008