THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:01:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Hope University School Of Medicine, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: unit 105 6935 120 street
delta
british columbia
v4e2a8
delta British Columbia V4E 2A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6045964000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Hope University School Of Medicine, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: unit 105 6935 120 street
delta
british columbia
v4e2a8
delta British Columbia V4E 2A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6045964000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KANWARINDER SINGH SIDHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIDHU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KANWARINDER SINGH SIDHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIDHU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Hope University School Of Medicine, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008