THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:32:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 2 - 39 Campus Trail
Huntsville Ontario P1H 0E5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 788-3623
Fax: (705) 788-3624
Address: Huntsville District Memorial
100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H8
Phone: (705) 789-2311
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 Jul 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniel Purcell & Rebecca Kent Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Apr 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Purcell (CPSO#: 89422 ) Dr. R. Kent (CPSO#: 88818 )
Business Address: 39 Campus Trail
Unit 2
Huntsville Ontario P1H0E5
705-788-3623
Business Address: 348 Muskoka Road 3 north
Suite 202
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H8
(705) 788-3623

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 2 - 39 Campus Trail
Huntsville Ontario P1H 0E5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 788-3623
Fax: (705) 788-3624
Address: Huntsville District Memorial
100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H8
Phone: (705) 789-2311
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 Jul 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniel Purcell & Rebecca Kent Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Apr 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Purcell (CPSO#: 89422 ) Dr. R. Kent (CPSO#: 88818 )
Business Address: 39 Campus Trail
Unit 2
Huntsville Ontario P1H0E5
705-788-3623
Business Address: 348 Muskoka Road 3 north
Suite 202
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H8
(705) 788-3623

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIEL MYRON PURCELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PURCELL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIEL MYRON PURCELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PURCELL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 01 Aug 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Aug 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008