THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/04/25 01:04:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Vermont, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Neonatology 4th Floor
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Extension: 87789
Fax: (416) 480-6054

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 02 Jul 2008
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 02 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Vermont, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Neonatology 4th Floor
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Extension: 87789
Fax: (416) 480-6054

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 02 Jul 2008
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 02 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
20 Mar 2015
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 20 2015
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Paige Terrien Church may practise medicine independently in paediatrics.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Paige Terrien Church may practise medicine independently in paediatrics.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Vermont, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 20 Mar 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 20 Mar 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 02 May 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 20 Mar 2015

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 20 Mar 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 02 May 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 2008