THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:14:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Cincinnati, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2867 Ellesmere Road
Centenary Hospital
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-284-8131
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Brampton Civic Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Peel Memorial
20 Lynch Street
Brampton Ontario L6W 2Z8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 9080 Yonge St
Richmond Hill Medical and Surgical Center
Level 2, Unit 12
Richmond Hill ON L4C 0Y7
Phone: 289-597-7676
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 123 Edward Street
Provis-Rudd
Toronto Ontario M5G 0A8
Phone: 416-854-9486
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 21 Jul 2008
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 21 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Colorado
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Cincinnati, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2867 Ellesmere Road
Centenary Hospital
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-284-8131
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Brampton Civic Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Peel Memorial
20 Lynch Street
Brampton Ontario L6W 2Z8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 9080 Yonge St
Richmond Hill Medical and Surgical Center
Level 2, Unit 12
Richmond Hill ON L4C 0Y7
Phone: 289-597-7676
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 123 Edward Street
Provis-Rudd
Toronto Ontario M5G 0A8
Phone: 416-854-9486
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 21 Jul 2008
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 21 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Colorado
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
04 Mar 2011
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 04 2011
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr Eric David Greenwood may practise medicine independently in anesthesiology, only.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr Eric David Greenwood may practise medicine independently in anesthesiology, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Cincinnati, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 04 Mar 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 04 Mar 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Mar 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 04 Mar 2011

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 04 Mar 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Mar 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Mar 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Mar 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Jul 2008