THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:10:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Nishtar Medical College, 1987
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 237 West Schrock Road
Westerville Ohio 43081
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6147271410
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 250 Erie Street South
Leamington Ontario N8H 3C2
Phone: 3174418351
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Central Walk in Clinic Leamington
250 Erie St S
Leamington Ontario N8H 3C2
Phone: (519) 398-9395
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Station Mall Walk-In Clinic
293 Bay St
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6A 1X3
Phone: (705) 450-1715
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3691 Tecumseh Rd E
Windsor ON N8W 1H8
Phone: 317-441-8351
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Central Walk in Clinic
5415 Tecumseh Rd E
Windsor Ontario N8T 1C5
Phone: (519) 948-5415
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jul 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 08 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida
USA - North Carolina
USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: Nishtar Medical College, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 237 West Schrock Road
Westerville Ohio 43081
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6147271410
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 250 Erie Street South
Leamington Ontario N8H 3C2
Phone: 3174418351
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Central Walk in Clinic Leamington
250 Erie St S
Leamington Ontario N8H 3C2
Phone: (519) 398-9395
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Station Mall Walk-In Clinic
293 Bay St
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6A 1X3
Phone: (705) 450-1715
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3691 Tecumseh Rd E
Windsor ON N8W 1H8
Phone: 317-441-8351
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Central Walk in Clinic
5415 Tecumseh Rd E
Windsor Ontario N8T 1C5
Phone: (519) 948-5415
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jul 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 08 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida
USA - North Carolina
USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BUSHRA IRAM WASIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WASIL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BUSHRA IRAM WASIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WASIL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Nishtar Medical College, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Oct 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 2008