THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:21:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad Techologica De Santiago, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1060 Speers Road
Suite 212
Oakville Ontario L6L 2X4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-582-7777
Fax: 905-215-2154

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical records may contact 289-400-2626
Date Received: 04 Nov 2015

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Universidad Techologica De Santiago, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1060 Speers Road
Suite 212
Oakville Ontario L6L 2X4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-582-7777
Fax: 905-215-2154

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical records may contact 289-400-2626
Date Received: 04 Nov 2015

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HURARA DEEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HURARA DEEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad Techologica De Santiago, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 25 Jan 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 2017

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 25 Jan 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Dec 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 06 Dec 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Feb 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2010

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Nov 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2008