THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:07:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Colombia, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3305 Harvester Road
Units 15-20
Burlington Ontario L7N 3N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056328007
Fax: 18445682931

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Sep 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: National University of Colombia, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3305 Harvester Road
Units 15-20
Burlington Ontario L7N 3N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056328007
Fax: 18445682931

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Sep 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANDRA MARCELA CHARMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHARMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANDRA MARCELA CHARMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHARMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Colombia, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 01 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2008
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Sep 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2010

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Nov 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Sep 2008