THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:38:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Colombo, 1980
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 24 Aug 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 24 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. T. Wickrama Arachchilage Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Feb 2025

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Colombo, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 24 Aug 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 24 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. T. Wickrama Arachchilage Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Feb 2025

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THAMARA WICKRAMA ARACHCHILAGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WICKRAMA ARACHCHILAGE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THAMARA WICKRAMA ARACHCHILAGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WICKRAMA ARACHCHILAGE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Colombo, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 25 Aug 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2008
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Nov 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 2008