THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 03:28:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of London, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Neurology
555 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-7721
Fax: 416-813-6334

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 24 Sep 2014
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of London, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Neurology
555 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-7721
Fax: 416-813-6334

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 24 Sep 2014
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
05 Aug 2021
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 05 2021
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Nomazulu Dlamini may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Pediatrics, Division of Pediatric Neurology, University of Toronto, in which Dr. Dlamini holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Dlamini no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.


VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Nomazulu Dlamini may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Pediatrics, Division of Pediatric Neurology, University of Toronto, in which Dr. Dlamini holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Dlamini no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.


Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of London, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 05 Aug 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 05 Aug 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Nov 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Sep 2008