THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:23:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Sarajevo, 1989
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BOSNIAN, CROATIAN, SERBIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients seeking a copy of their medical record may write to:

Rideau Valley Health Centre
1221 Greenbank Road
Ottawa, ON, K2J 5V7
Date Received: 09 Mar 2022

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Prince Edward Island

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Budimka Oroz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Mar 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BOSNIAN, CROATIAN, SERBIAN
Medical School: University of Sarajevo, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients seeking a copy of their medical record may write to:

Rideau Valley Health Centre
1221 Greenbank Road
Ottawa, ON, K2J 5V7
Date Received: 09 Mar 2022

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Prince Edward Island

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Budimka Oroz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Mar 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BUDIMKA OROZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OROZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BUDIMKA OROZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OROZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Sarajevo, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2008
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Sep 2008