THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/04/25 03:43:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universite Pierre et Marie Curie, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Universite Pierre et Marie Curie, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universite Pierre et Marie Curie, 1998
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery
01 Oct 2009 to 30 Sep 2010
University of Ottawa
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery
01 Nov 2008 to 30 Sep 2009
University of Ottawa
PEAP - CF - Cardiac Surgery
01 Oct 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery
DATE: 01 Oct 2009 to 30 Sep 2010
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery
DATE: 01 Nov 2008 to 30 Sep 2009
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Cardiac Surgery
DATE: 01 Oct 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2008
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2010

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Nov 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2008