THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:10:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2-80 Michael Cowpland Dr
Kanata ON K2M 1P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-599-3321
Fax: 613-599-3366

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Dec 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 14 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2-80 Michael Cowpland Dr
Kanata ON K2M 1P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-599-3321
Fax: 613-599-3366

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Dec 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 14 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTINE JOAN YEE-JEN TAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTINE JOAN YEE-JEN TAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Aug 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2008
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Dec 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jan 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2008