THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/04/25 06:13:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2-316 Rideau Street
ByWard Family Health Team
Ottawa Ontario K1N 1A3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 564-3950
Fax: (613)564-6627

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Oct 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 19 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2-316 Rideau Street
ByWard Family Health Team
Ottawa Ontario K1N 1A3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 564-3950
Fax: (613)564-6627

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Oct 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 19 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ASSER ADEL AHMED ALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ASSER ADEL AHMED ALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 25 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Nov 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Dec 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Apr 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 13 Apr 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Nov 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 25 Oct 2010

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jan 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2008