THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:43:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 110
470 Bronte St South
Milton Ontario L9T 2J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 636-0766
Fax: (905) 636-0429

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Abhimanyu Sadera Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 Sep 2013

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 110
470 Bronte St South
Milton Ontario L9T 2J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 636-0766
Fax: (905) 636-0429

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Abhimanyu Sadera Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 Sep 2013

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABHIMANYU JAGIR SINGH SADERA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SADERA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABHIMANYU JAGIR SINGH SADERA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SADERA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2016
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 11 Aug 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 18 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2008
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Aug 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jan 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 18 Oct 2010

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jan 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2008