THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 05:43:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Makerere Univ, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Postgraduate Medical Education
McMaster University
Room MDCL - 3113
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Makerere Univ, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Postgraduate Medical Education
McMaster University
Room MDCL - 3113
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REJANI LALITHA KUMARI may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. REJANI LALITHA KUMARI is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. REJANI LALITHA KUMARI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. REJANI LALITHA KUMARI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. REJANI LALITHA KUMARI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. REJANI LALITHA KUMARI ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. REJANI LALITHA KUMARI ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REJANI LALITHA KUMARI may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. REJANI LALITHA KUMARI is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. REJANI LALITHA KUMARI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. REJANI LALITHA KUMARI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. REJANI LALITHA KUMARI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. REJANI LALITHA KUMARI ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. REJANI LALITHA KUMARI ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Makerere Univ, 2003
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Respirology
01 Jul 2025 to 23 Sep 2025
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Respirology
16 Nov 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
McMaster University
PEAP - CF - Respirology
24 Sep 2024 to 15 Nov 2024
McMaster University
EL - Internal Medicine
22 Oct 2008 to 02 Feb 2009
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Respirology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 23 Sep 2025
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Respirology
DATE: 16 Nov 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Respirology
DATE: 24 Sep 2024 to 15 Nov 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: EL - Internal Medicine
DATE: 22 Oct 2008 to 02 Feb 2009
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 02 Feb 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2008
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 02 Feb 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2008