THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:18:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University College, Cork, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 481 London Road
Sarnia Ontario N7T 4X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 491-7965
Fax: (519) 491-7494
Address: 2-316 George St
Sarnia ON N7T 4P4
Phone: 5193376200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Oct 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 19 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bluewater Health Sarnia
HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John Charles O'Mahony Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Mar 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. J. O'Mahony (CPSO#: 89988 )
Business Address: 481 London Road
Sarnia Ontario N7T 4X3
(519) 491-7965

Corporation Name: Dr. John O'Mahony Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Dec 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University College, Cork, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 481 London Road
Sarnia Ontario N7T 4X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 491-7965
Fax: (519) 491-7494
Address: 2-316 George St
Sarnia ON N7T 4P4
Phone: 5193376200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Oct 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 19 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bluewater Health Sarnia
HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John Charles O'Mahony Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Mar 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. J. O'Mahony (CPSO#: 89988 )
Business Address: 481 London Road
Sarnia Ontario N7T 4X3
(519) 491-7965

Corporation Name: Dr. John O'Mahony Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Dec 2019

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN CHARLES O'MAHONY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'MAHONY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN CHARLES O'MAHONY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'MAHONY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University College, Cork, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2010

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jan 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2008