THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:41:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: George Washington University, 1992
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 204B-86 Angeline St S
Lindsay ON K9V 6C5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7053208874
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 03 Nov 2008
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 03 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

HOSPITAL: Almonte General Hospital
LOCATION: Almonte

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G.O. Lawson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 22 Mar 2016

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: George Washington University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 204B-86 Angeline St S
Lindsay ON K9V 6C5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7053208874
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 03 Nov 2008
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 03 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

HOSPITAL: Almonte General Hospital
LOCATION: Almonte

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G.O. Lawson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 22 Mar 2016

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
08 Apr 2010
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Apr 08 2010
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon

1. Dr. Glasine Ortenza Lawson may practise medicine independently in
Obstetrics and Gynaecology, only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon

1. Dr. Glasine Ortenza Lawson may practise medicine independently in
Obstetrics and Gynaecology, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: George Washington University, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 08 Apr 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 08 Apr 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2008
DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 08 Apr 2010

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 08 Apr 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Nov 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Nov 2008