THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 04:44:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196858138
Fax: 519-685-8105
Address: Bluewater Health
89 Norman St
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6S3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bluewater Health Sarnia
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. James Brokenshire Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 21 Mar 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196858138
Fax: 519-685-8105
Address: Bluewater Health
89 Norman St
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6S3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bluewater Health Sarnia
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. James Brokenshire Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 21 Mar 2019

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREA RAE DORIS ENS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ENS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREA RAE DORIS ENS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ENS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Mar 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 20 Nov 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Dec 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Oct 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Mar 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Feb 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 20 Nov 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Oct 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Dec 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 2008