THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:05:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Minsk State Medical Institute, 1993
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Southlake Regional Health Center
596 Davis Drive , West 5
Child and family Clinic
inpatient unit
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Extension: 2215
Fax: (905) 830-5977
Address: 3740, Line 13
Cookstown Ontario L0L 1L0
Phone: 705 728-5044
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN
Medical School: Minsk State Medical Institute, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Southlake Regional Health Center
596 Davis Drive , West 5
Child and family Clinic
inpatient unit
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Extension: 2215
Fax: (905) 830-5977
Address: 3740, Line 13
Cookstown Ontario L0L 1L0
Phone: 705 728-5044
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DIANA GRIGOREVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRIGOREVA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DIANA GRIGOREVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRIGOREVA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Minsk State Medical Institute, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2008
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Nov 2008