THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 06:03:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Republic, 1988
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HEBREW, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 9600 Stn Main
825 Manitoba Ave, Selkirk , MB
Forensic Psychiatry
Barnett Building
Selkirk MB R1A 2B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 204 482 3810
Extension: 655
Fax: 204 785 8936
Address: 199 Richmond St W
Toronto ON M5V 0H4
Phone: 1-800-254-1235
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 103-778 Sheppard Ave W
Toronto ON M3H 6B7
Phone: 6473475000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Aug 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 26 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba
Canada - New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HEBREW, SPANISH
Medical School: University of the Republic, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 9600 Stn Main
825 Manitoba Ave, Selkirk , MB
Forensic Psychiatry
Barnett Building
Selkirk MB R1A 2B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 204 482 3810
Extension: 655
Fax: 204 785 8936
Address: 199 Richmond St W
Toronto ON M5V 0H4
Phone: 1-800-254-1235
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 103-778 Sheppard Ave W
Toronto ON M3H 6B7
Phone: 6473475000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Aug 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 26 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba
Canada - New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CLAUDIA LAMSCHTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAMSCHTEIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CLAUDIA LAMSCHTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAMSCHTEIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Republic, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Mar 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2008
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2010

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Mar 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 2008