THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:06:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 130 HIGHWAY 20 EAST
UNIT A6
Fonthill Ontario L0S 1E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 892-1010
Fax: (905) 892-4004

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Goswami Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Jun 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 130 HIGHWAY 20 EAST
UNIT A6
Fonthill Ontario L0S 1E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 892-1010
Fax: (905) 892-4004

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Goswami Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Jun 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RUPASHI GOSWAMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOSWAMI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RUPASHI GOSWAMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOSWAMI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jan 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 2008
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Feb 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jan 2010

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Feb 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Dec 2008