THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:44:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Joseph Health Centre
30 Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 530-6000
Extension: 4300
Fax: (416) 530-6472

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 12 Oct 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 14 Dec 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 12 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 14 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: CY Kim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Sep 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Joseph Health Centre
30 Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 530-6000
Extension: 4300
Fax: (416) 530-6472

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 12 Oct 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 14 Dec 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 12 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 14 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: CY Kim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Sep 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTIE YEAN KIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTIE YEAN KIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Dec 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2009