THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/04/25 17:38:46 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 12 Oct 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 12 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 12 Oct 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 12 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2007
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
EL - Hematology
24 Aug 2009 to 13 Sep 2009
University of Toronto
EL - Hematology
25 Jan 2009 to 07 Feb 2009
Queen's University
EL - Hematology
12 Jan 2009 to 24 Jan 2009
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: EL - Hematology
DATE: 24 Aug 2009 to 13 Sep 2009
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - Hematology
DATE: 25 Jan 2009 to 07 Feb 2009
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: EL - Hematology
DATE: 12 Jan 2009 to 24 Jan 2009
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 07 Feb 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2009
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Sep 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 07 Feb 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2009