THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:38:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: UNIVERSITA DEGLI STUDI DI CAGLIARI, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Pathology
11E208
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-5049
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 700 Ross Avenue
Timmins Ontario P4N 8P2
Phone: (705) 360-6024
Extension: 3129
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 02 Oct 2009
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 02 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: UNIVERSITA DEGLI STUDI DI CAGLIARI, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Pathology
11E208
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-5049
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 700 Ross Avenue
Timmins Ontario P4N 8P2
Phone: (705) 360-6024
Extension: 3129
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 02 Oct 2009
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 02 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
23 Oct 2015
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Oct 23 2015
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Stefano Serra may practise medicine independently in pathology.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Stefano Serra may practise medicine independently in pathology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: UNIVERSITA DEGLI STUDI DI CAGLIARI, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 28 Oct 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 23 Oct 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 11 Sep 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 01 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2009
DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 28 Oct 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 23 Oct 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 11 Sep 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Oct 2009
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Oct 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2009

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Mar 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Feb 2009