THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:41:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dow Medical College, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mukarram Ali Zaidi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 May 2013

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU
Medical School: Dow Medical College, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mukarram Ali Zaidi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 May 2013

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dow Medical College, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Jan 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 04 Nov 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2009
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Jan 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Nov 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Nov 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 04 Nov 2011

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Mar 2009