THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:51:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 16 Apr 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 05 Apr 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Mar 2009
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 16 Apr 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Apr 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 05 Apr 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Mar 2009