THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/05/25 04:56:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 565 Sanatorium Road
Unit 109
Hamilton Ontario L9C 5K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2896395532
Fax: 9055255232

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 24 Sep 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 565 Sanatorium Road
Unit 109
Hamilton Ontario L9C 5K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2896395532
Fax: 9055255232

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 24 Sep 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUSAN REILLY TESCHKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TESCHKE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUSAN REILLY TESCHKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TESCHKE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 20 Nov 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 06 May 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2009
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jun 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 20 Nov 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 06 May 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Apr 2009