THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:05:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Univ of Med & Dentistry of New Jersey, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto General Hospital
11-PMB-172
585 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Extension: 5404
Fax: (416) 340-4039

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 11 Jan 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 11 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Trevor Reichman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Mar 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Univ of Med & Dentistry of New Jersey, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto General Hospital
11-PMB-172
585 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Extension: 5404
Fax: (416) 340-4039

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 11 Jan 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 11 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Trevor Reichman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Mar 2024

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
09 Mar 2021
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 09 2021
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Trevor William Reichman may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery,
Division of General Surgery, University of Toronto, in which Dr.
Reichman holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate
Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Reichman
no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Trevor William Reichman may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery,
Division of General Surgery, University of Toronto, in which Dr.
Reichman holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate
Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Reichman
no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Univ of Med & Dentistry of New Jersey, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 09 Mar 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 09 Mar 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jan 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Jan 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009