THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:43:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SERBIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Etobicoke Medical Centre
Family Health Team
400-85 East Mall
Etobicoke Ontario M8Z5W4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 621-2220
Fax: (416) 621-2203

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 Mar 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 28 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SERBIAN
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Etobicoke Medical Centre
Family Health Team
400-85 East Mall
Etobicoke Ontario M8Z5W4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 621-2220
Fax: (416) 621-2203

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 Mar 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 28 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEKSANDRA BRANKOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRANKOVIC is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEKSANDRA BRANKOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRANKOVIC is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Mar 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Apr 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Mar 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009