THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:17:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 31 Glencrest Blvd
East York ON M4B 1L2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4165248830
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 03 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Australia
Canada - Manitoba
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 31 Glencrest Blvd
East York ON M4B 1L2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4165248830
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 03 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Australia
Canada - Manitoba
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELIZABETH ANN SMALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMALL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELIZABETH ANN SMALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMALL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Apr 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Apr 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Apr 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2013

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009