THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 03:56:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 19 Hospital Drive
Moose Factory Ontario P0L 1W0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 658-4544
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Dec 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Weeneebayko Health Ahtuskaywin Attawapiskat Site Attawapiskat
Weeneebayko Health Ahtuskaywin Moosonee Site Moosonee
Weeneebayko Health Ahtuskaywin Fort Albany Site Fort Albany
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority Moose Factory
HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Health Ahtuskaywin Attawapiskat Site
LOCATION: Attawapiskat

HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Health Ahtuskaywin Moosonee Site
LOCATION: Moosonee

HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Health Ahtuskaywin Fort Albany Site
LOCATION: Fort Albany

HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Area Health Authority
LOCATION: Moose Factory

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 19 Hospital Drive
Moose Factory Ontario P0L 1W0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 658-4544
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Dec 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Weeneebayko Health Ahtuskaywin Attawapiskat Site Attawapiskat
Weeneebayko Health Ahtuskaywin Moosonee Site Moosonee
Weeneebayko Health Ahtuskaywin Fort Albany Site Fort Albany
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority Moose Factory
HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Health Ahtuskaywin Attawapiskat Site
LOCATION: Attawapiskat

HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Health Ahtuskaywin Moosonee Site
LOCATION: Moosonee

HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Health Ahtuskaywin Fort Albany Site
LOCATION: Fort Albany

HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Area Health Authority
LOCATION: Moose Factory

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATHERINE ANN TURNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TURNER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATHERINE ANN TURNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TURNER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jan 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009