THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 10:05:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1466 Bathurst Street
Suite 205
Toronto Ontario M5R3S3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 483-8111
Fax: 416-483-8182

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 29 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Lai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Sep 2020

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1466 Bathurst Street
Suite 205
Toronto Ontario M5R3S3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 483-8111
Fax: 416-483-8182

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 29 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Lai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Sep 2020

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GARMING ELLIOT LAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GARMING ELLIOT LAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009