THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:39:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 237 Barton St E
Hamilton General Hospital
Hematology, Room 1-270B
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 527-0271
Extension: 46139
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 07 Nov 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 07 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew Shih Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Sep 2017

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 237 Barton St E
Hamilton General Hospital
Hematology, Room 1-270B
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 527-0271
Extension: 46139
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 07 Nov 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 07 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew Shih Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Sep 2017

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW WEI-YEH SHIH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHIH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW WEI-YEH SHIH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHIH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 2023
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 08 Aug 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Nov 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 08 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Dec 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009