THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:58:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Etobicoke General Hospital
C/O Medical Staff Office
101 Humber College Blvd
Toronto Ontario M9V 1R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 21 Sep 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Havey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Dec 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Etobicoke General Hospital
C/O Medical Staff Office
101 Humber College Blvd
Toronto Ontario M9V 1R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 21 Sep 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Havey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Dec 2021

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Member
24 Mar 2021
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Member
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 24 2021
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon

As from March 24, 2021, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Thomas Ciaran Havey in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Havey to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

Dr. Havey has voluntarily resigned his prescribing privileges with respect to narcotic drugs, narcotic preparations, controlled drugs, benzodiazepines and other targeted substances and monitored drugs, as amended from time to time in the governing regulations.






VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon

As from March 24, 2021, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Thomas Ciaran Havey in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Havey to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

Dr. Havey has voluntarily resigned his prescribing privileges with respect to narcotic drugs, narcotic preparations, controlled drugs, benzodiazepines and other targeted substances and monitored drugs, as amended from time to time in the governing regulations.






Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 24 Mar 2021
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Thomas Ciaran Havey to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 24, 2021:

Dr. Havey has voluntarily resigned his prescribing privileges with respect to narcotic drugs, narcotic preparations, controlled drugs, benzodiazepines and other targeted substances and monitored drugs, as amended from time to time in the governing regulations 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 24 Mar 2021
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Thomas Ciaran Havey to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 24, 2021:

Dr. Havey has voluntarily resigned his prescribing privileges with respect to narcotic drugs, narcotic preparations, controlled drugs, benzodiazepines and other targeted substances and monitored drugs, as amended from time to time in the governing regulations 

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 24 Mar 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Mar 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 24 Mar 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Mar 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Feb 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009