THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/04/25 00:39:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: Nurmohamed, Laila (Used Until: 10 Jan 2016)
Medical School: Thomas Jefferson University, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Paediatrics
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-7654
Extension: 224698
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: Nurmohamed, Laila (Used Until: 10 Jan 2016)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Thomas Jefferson University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Paediatrics
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-7654
Extension: 224698
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAILA PREMJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PREMJI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAILA PREMJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PREMJI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Thomas Jefferson University, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 23 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009