THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:50:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 22
470 Chrysler Drive
Brampton Ontario L6S 0C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 595-2012
Fax: (905) 595-2013
Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Room N5-794
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Dec 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 14 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 22
470 Chrysler Drive
Brampton Ontario L6S 0C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 595-2012
Fax: (905) 595-2013
Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Room N5-794
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Dec 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 14 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATIE YU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATIE YU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009