THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:26:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 103
3910 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M3H 5Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 636-2203
Fax: (647) 689-2199

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Adolescent Medicine
Effective: 31 Dec 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 31 Dec 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Adolescent Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 103
3910 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M3H 5Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 636-2203
Fax: (647) 689-2199

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Adolescent Medicine
Effective: 31 Dec 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 31 Dec 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Adolescent Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIEL KUPFERT HELLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HELLER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIEL KUPFERT HELLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HELLER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009