THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 03:46:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 7750 Bayview Ave
Shouldice Hospital
Thornhill ON L3T 4A3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-889-1125
Fax: 905-889-4216

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
Shouldice Hospital Ltd. Markham
HOSPITAL: Temiskaming Hospital
LOCATION: New Liskeard

HOSPITAL: Shouldice Hospital Ltd.
LOCATION: Markham

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 7750 Bayview Ave
Shouldice Hospital
Thornhill ON L3T 4A3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-889-1125
Fax: 905-889-4216

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
Shouldice Hospital Ltd. Markham
HOSPITAL: Temiskaming Hospital
LOCATION: New Liskeard

HOSPITAL: Shouldice Hospital Ltd.
LOCATION: Markham

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES PATRICK VILLAMERE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VILLAMERE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES PATRICK VILLAMERE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VILLAMERE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2018
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 10 Aug 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Dec 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 10 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Feb 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 15 Feb 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Apr 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009