THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:28:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: NorWest Community Health Centres
525 Simpson Street
Thunder Bay Ontario P7C 3J6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 622-8235
Fax: (807) 622-3548
Address: 225 Richmond Street West
Maple
Primary Care
Na-house calls
Toronto Ontario M5V 1W2
Phone: 647-497-7453
Fax: 1-888-745-0435

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Dec 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 15 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ella Goodman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Mar 2014

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: NorWest Community Health Centres
525 Simpson Street
Thunder Bay Ontario P7C 3J6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 622-8235
Fax: (807) 622-3548
Address: 225 Richmond Street West
Maple
Primary Care
Na-house calls
Toronto Ontario M5V 1W2
Phone: 647-497-7453
Fax: 1-888-745-0435

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Dec 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 15 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ella Goodman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Mar 2014

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELLA MAYE GOODMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOODMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELLA MAYE GOODMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOODMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 18 Dec 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009