THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:16:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Avenue Medical Centre
221 Brant Avenue
Brantford Ontario N3T 3J2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 752-0970
Fax: (519) 753-6880
Address: 7 Welland Avenue
St. Catharines Ontario L2R 2L8
Phone: 289 2734561
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nick Minos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 May 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Avenue Medical Centre
221 Brant Avenue
Brantford Ontario N3T 3J2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 752-0970
Fax: (519) 753-6880
Address: 7 Welland Avenue
St. Catharines Ontario L2R 2L8
Phone: 289 2734561
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nick Minos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 May 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICK MINOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MINOS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICK MINOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MINOS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009