THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:23:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4200 Emile Street
University of Nebraska Medical Center
Division of Surgical Oncology/Department of Surgery
986880 Nebraska Medical Center
Omaha Nebraska 68198
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4025597272
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4200 Emile Street
University of Nebraska Medical Center
Division of Surgical Oncology/Department of Surgery
986880 Nebraska Medical Center
Omaha Nebraska 68198
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4025597272
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JESSICA ELIZABETH MAXWELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAXWELL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JESSICA ELIZABETH MAXWELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAXWELL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 2025
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 10 Aug 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jan 2025

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 10 Aug 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009