THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:39:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Yerevan State Medical University, 1993
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARMENIAN, RUSSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 7120 Hurontario St
Mississauga ON L5W 1N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058667197
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3350 Fairview St
Health@3350-Sexual Health Clinic
Burlington ON L7N 3L5
Phone: 2899811244
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Public Health and Preventive Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Public Health and Preventive Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARMENIAN, RUSSIAN
Medical School: Yerevan State Medical University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 7120 Hurontario St
Mississauga ON L5W 1N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058667197
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3350 Fairview St
Health@3350-Sexual Health Clinic
Burlington ON L7N 3L5
Phone: 2899811244
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Public Health and Preventive Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Public Health and Preventive Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GAYANE HOVHANNISYAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOVHANNISYAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GAYANE HOVHANNISYAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOVHANNISYAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Yerevan State Medical University, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Aug 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009