THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/05/25 02:23:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Islamic Azad University, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PERSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 110-955 Major Mackenzie Dr
Maple ON L6A 4P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-303-0304
Fax: 905-770-7733
Address: 11-965 Bovaird Dr W
Brampton ON L6X 5K7
Phone: 905-497-7779
Fax: 905-770-7733
Address: 30 Prospect street
Newmarket Ontario L3Y3S9
Phone: (905) 235-7284
Fax: 905-770-7733

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fesharaki Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 25 Nov 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PERSIAN
Medical School: Islamic Azad University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 110-955 Major Mackenzie Dr
Maple ON L6A 4P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-303-0304
Fax: 905-770-7733
Address: 11-965 Bovaird Dr W
Brampton ON L6X 5K7
Phone: 905-497-7779
Fax: 905-770-7733
Address: 30 Prospect street
Newmarket Ontario L3Y3S9
Phone: (905) 235-7284
Fax: 905-770-7733

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fesharaki Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 25 Nov 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARYAM FESHARAKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FESHARAKI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARYAM FESHARAKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FESHARAKI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Islamic Azad University, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009