THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:32:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 207
820 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall Ontario K6H 4M4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 935-6414
Fax: (613) 935-8560

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Sep 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 207
820 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall Ontario K6H 4M4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 935-6414
Fax: (613) 935-8560

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Sep 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAWAHIR ISMAIL ABAKER IBRAHIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IBRAHIM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAWAHIR ISMAIL ABAKER IBRAHIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IBRAHIM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Aug 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Aug 2011

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009