THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 03:00:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Health Sciences Antigua, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 700 Main Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8M 1K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 545-1376
Fax: (905) 545-6793
Address: 2200 Dundas Street East, Unit 4A
Mississauga Ontario L4X 2V3
Phone: 905 232-0720
Fax: 905 232-0790

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 28 May 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 28 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ewa A. Pasyk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH
Medical School: University of Health Sciences Antigua, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 700 Main Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8M 1K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 545-1376
Fax: (905) 545-6793
Address: 2200 Dundas Street East, Unit 4A
Mississauga Ontario L4X 2V3
Phone: 905 232-0720
Fax: 905 232-0790

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 28 May 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 28 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ewa A. Pasyk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EWA ANNA PASYK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PASYK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EWA ANNA PASYK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PASYK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Health Sciences Antigua, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Jan 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Sep 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Jan 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009