THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 05:35:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Jordan Faculty of Medicine, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1952 Bay Street
Royal Jubilee Hospital
Dialysis Unit
Victoria British Columbia V8R 1J8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6478699057
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Aloudat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Sep 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Jordan Faculty of Medicine, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1952 Bay Street
Royal Jubilee Hospital
Dialysis Unit
Victoria British Columbia V8R 1J8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6478699057
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Aloudat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Sep 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH IBRAHIM MNAZEL ALOUDAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALOUDAT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH IBRAHIM MNAZEL ALOUDAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALOUDAT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Jordan Faculty of Medicine, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Dec 2010

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009