THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 03:30:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Dr East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 30 The Queensway
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Emergency Department
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Phone: 4165306000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hays Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Apr 2025

Corporation Name: Hays Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Dec 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Dr East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 30 The Queensway
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Emergency Department
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Phone: 4165306000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hays Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Apr 2025

Corporation Name: Hays Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Dec 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LUKE AHMED HAYS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAYS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LUKE AHMED HAYS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAYS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 02 Aug 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 2009