THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:49:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 309-200 Cachet Woods Crt
Markham ON L6C 0Z8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056056745
Fax: 9057382474
Address: 200 Cachet Woods Crt
Unit 309
Markham ON L6C 0Z8
Phone: 9056056745
Fax: 9057382474
Address: 1188 B Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M6C 2E3
Phone: 416-785-7864
Fax: (647) 255-2587

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Monique M. Mazzuca Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Sep 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ITALIAN
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 309-200 Cachet Woods Crt
Markham ON L6C 0Z8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056056745
Fax: 9057382474
Address: 200 Cachet Woods Crt
Unit 309
Markham ON L6C 0Z8
Phone: 9056056745
Fax: 9057382474
Address: 1188 B Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M6C 2E3
Phone: 416-785-7864
Fax: (647) 255-2587

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Monique M. Mazzuca Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Sep 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MONIQUE MARIE MAZZUCA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAZZUCA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MONIQUE MARIE MAZZUCA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAZZUCA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Sep 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Jan 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 09 Aug 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 09 Feb 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2009
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Sep 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Sep 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Feb 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Feb 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jan 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 13 Jan 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 09 Feb 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Oct 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2009